Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
West, Arielle, West Jr., David, filed a(n) Money case against Thoma, Christine, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2017 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLAIM HEARING OF AUG-07-2017 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED | |
June 26, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: RESET OF TRIAL DATE FOR NON-SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEST, ARIELLE WEST JR., DAVID | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | TRIAL RESET TO AUG-07-2017 AT 05:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF JUN-26-2017 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE FEE FOR SERVICE: $40.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEST, ARIELLE WEST JR., DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT THOMA, CHRISTINE | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF PER U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, "RETURN TO SENDER-UNCLAIMED-UNABLE TO FORWARD." COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO DEFENDANT THOMA, CHRISTINE | |
May 01, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE : FEE FOR SERVICE $40.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEST, ARIELLE WEST JR., DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT THOMA, CHRISTINE | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RE: RESET OF TRIAL DATE TO ALLOW MORE TIME FOR SERVICE. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEST, ARIELLE WEST JR., DAVID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.