Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sei, Sen 420 Berry Street #, filed a(n) Money case against Chinatown Community Development Center,Inc., Related Management Company, Lp Time Warner Center New York, Ny 10232, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time83 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 08, 2017ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: February 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SEI, SEN IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT CHINATOWN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTER,INC. RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LP THE EVIDENCE DOES NOT SUPPORT THAT DEFENDANTS BREACHED ANY DUTY OWED TO PLAINTIFF OR THAT DEFENDANTS' CONDUCT CAUSED ANY LOSS, HARM OR DAMAGES TO PLAINTIFF. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LP | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHINATOWN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTER,INC. | |
March 08, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAR-08-2017 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-08-2017 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. PLAINTIFF SEN SEI IS PRESENT. DEFENDANTS CHINATOWN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC AND RELATED MANAGEMENT CO, LP ARE PRESENT. REPRESENTED BY SAHNNON MADRID, PROPERTY MANAGER. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-08-2017 - JUDGMENT. | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-13-2017, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LP | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SEE SIGNATURE) SERVED FEB-08-2017, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT CHINATOWN COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTER,INC. | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEI, SEN AS TO DEFENDANT RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.