Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Horta, Abelino, Rodriguez-Carreno, Maria, filed a(n) Money case against Alfa Bros, Inc. Dba Alfa Travel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2016 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time265 days |
DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BY DEFENDANT ALFA BROS, INC. DBA ALFA TRAVEL
Date: September 09, 2016ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED
Date: March 04, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $551.42 RE 34313 FOR TRANSACTION W0616909D003 (DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT), PAYABLE TO M RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO & A HORTA, DOC #1907907457, WARRANT #38204663, DATED OCT-31-2016 | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT ALFA BROS, INC. DBA ALFA TRAVEL | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENTS CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS COPIED TO ACCOUNTING FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORTA, ABELINO | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENTS CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS COPIED TO ACCOUNTING FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO, MARIA | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS (COPY OF REQUEST FORWARDED TO ACCOUNTING) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO, MARIA HORTA, ABELINO | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BY DEFENDANT ALFA BROS, INC. DBA ALFA TRAVEL | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR OF DEPOSIT OF COPY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT THE WINDOW. FILED BY DEFENDANT ALFA BROS, INC. DBA ALFA TRAVEL | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO, MARIA HORTA, ABELINO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ALFA BROS, INC. DBA ALFA TRAVEL $500.00 PRINCIPAL, $45.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $545.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
July 28, 2016 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUL-28-2016 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUL-28-2016 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFFS MARIA RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO & ABELINO HORTA, AND DEFENDANT'S REPRESENTATIVE FRANCISCO CABRERA, CEO OF ALFA BROTHERS, INC., DBA ALFA TRAVEL. COURT CERTIFIED SPANISH SPEAKING INTERPRETER MARGO SEELY ASSISTED MS. RODRIGUEZ-CARRENO & MR. HORTA AT THIS MORNING'S HEARING. PROOF OF SERVICE IN THE FILE. EXHIBITS RETURNED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. MITCHELL. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. NOT REPORTED. (D506). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.