Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Oportun Inc., filed a(n) Money case against Islas, Guillermo Tome, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2016 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED JUL-01-2016 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF OPORTUN INC. (FORMERLY PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.) RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ISLAS, GUILLERMO TOME $2,500.00 PRINCIPAL, $95.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,595.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-01-2016 - JUDGMENT. | |
April 01, 2016 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-01-2016 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-01-2016 BY JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID FLEISIG. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RETAINED. PRO TEM JUDGE: DAVID FLEISIG. CLERK: J. BERTELSEN. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF OPORTUN INC. (FORMERLY PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OPORTUN INC. (FORMERLY PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.) | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 45.00 - SERVED FEB-29-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT ISLAS, GUILLERMO TOME | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,500.00 FILED BY OPORTUN INC. (FORMERLY PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.) AS TO DEFENDANT ISLAS, GUILLERMO TOME ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-01-2016 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.