Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Young, Russell, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Yang, Raymond C O Vision Financial Group San Francisco, Ca 94116, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time154 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED JUL-01-2016 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YOUNG, RUSSELL IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT YANG, RAYMOND STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-16-2016 - JUDGMENT. | |
March 16, 2016 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAR-16-2016 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-16-2016 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. PLAINTIFF WAS PRESENT. DEFENDANT WAS PRESENT. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: J.BERTELSEN. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FEE FOR SERVICE: $0.00 SERVED FEB-12-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT YANG, RAYMOND | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,500.00 FILED BY YOUNG, RUSSELL AS TO DEFENDANT YANG, RAYMOND ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-16-2016 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.