Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fallahee, Richard, Rajagopal, Asha, filed a(n) Money case against Blackburn, Frank, Blackburn, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time591 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S DECLARATION RE:REQUEST TO ENTER SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 116.850. REQUEST GRANTED. THE JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED. (JUDGMENT ENTERED ON: 03,28,14.) | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | DEBTOR'S REQUEST FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO DEPT.506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW & SIGNATURE. FILED BY DEFENDANT BLACKBURN, MATTHEW | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEES $45.00 SERVED JAN-15-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BLACKBURN, FRANK | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FALLAHEE, RICHARD RAJAGOPAL, ASHA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BLACKBURN, FRANK BLACKBURN, MATTHEW $5,900.21 PRINCIPAL, $105.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,005.21 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
February 28, 2014 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF FEB-28-2014 - JUDGMENT. | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF FEB-28-2014 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF FEB-28-2014 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. PLAINTIFFS (2) WERE PRESENT. DEFENDANTS (2) WERE PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER MAILED 01/06/2014 TO DEFENDANT, FRANK BLACKBURN. ENVELOPE MARKED RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD. | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -SIGNED SERVED JAN-08-2014, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT BLACKBURN, MATTHEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.