Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Miller, John, Miller, Trudi, Richard, Cheryl, filed a(n) Money case against Handyman Konnection, Miller, John, Miller, Trudi, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2011 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time112 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2011CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED
Date: April 06, 2011TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (NO EXHIBITS WERE TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)
Date: April 07, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (NO EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT RICHARD, CHERYL RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT HANDYMAN KONNECTION MILLER, JOHN $1,300.00 PRINCIPAL, $50.40 INTEREST, $169.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,519.40, TRUDI MILLER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CROSS CLAIM JUDGMENT IS ORDERED IN FAVOR OF JOHN MILLER AND AGAINST CHERYL RICHARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1000.00 PRINCIPAL. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE SUBJECT TOOLS OF JOHN MILLER IN POSESSION OF CHERYL RICHARD HAVE BEEN CONVERTED AND THIS JUDGMENT IS BASED ON THAT FINDING. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF MAY-11-2011 - JUDGMENT ENTERED. CLERK - LESLIE GOMEZ, NOTHING ON RECORD, DEPT. 414 | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY RICHARD, CHERYL MILLER, JOHN | |
May 11, 2011 | Hearing | SMALL CLAIM APPEALS | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAY-11-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 414 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (NO EXHIBITS WERE TRANSFERRED FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR MAY-11-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 414 | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.