Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Young, Donart, filed a(n) Money case against Manahan, Alessandro G, Young, Donart, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions273 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time299 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2011ORDER PETITION FOR REHEARING
Date: October 18, 2011CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED
Date: March 15, 2011OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNG, DONART
Date: October 14, 2011PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY APPELLANT MANAHAN, ALESSANDRO G
Date: October 07, 2011TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (RECEIVED NO EXHIBIT FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)
Date: March 16, 2011ORDER CONTINUING SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL
Date: April 12, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER PETITION FOR REHEARING | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (NO EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNG, DONART | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR REHEARING FILED BY APPELLANT MANAHAN, ALESSANDRO G | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RETURNED TO APPELLANT MANAHAN, ALESSANDRO G | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT YOUNG, DONART RECOVER FROM APPELLANT MANAHAN, ALESSANDRO G $7,500.00 PRINCIPAL, $95.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,595.00 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | SHORT CAUSE TRIAL ON MAY-12-2011 OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ENTERED. | |
May 12, 2011 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
May 12, 2011 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: UNKNOWN JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.