Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bair, Steven P.O. Box 160 Camp Meeker, 95419, filed a(n) Money case against Roger Quiring Dba Quiring Properties, Palm Court A, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2010 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time256 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED OCT-01-2010 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BAIR, STEVEN IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT ROGER QUIRING DBA QUIRING PROPERTIES, PALM COURT A T CARL ST. LLC STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUL-16-2010 - JUDGMENT. | |
July 16, 2010 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PRO TEM ALEX ANOLIK FILED BY BAIR, STEVEN ROGER QUIRING DBA QUIRING PROPERTIES, PALM COURT A T CARL ST. LLC | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUL-16-2010 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUL-16-2010 BY JUDGE PRO TEM: ALEX ANOLIK. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT EXHIBITS RETAINED. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROGER QUIRING DBA QUIRING PROPERTIES, PALM COURT A T CARL ST. LLC | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $55.00) SERVED JUN-11-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROGER QUIRING DBA QUIRING PROPERTIES, PALM COURT A T CARL ST. LLC | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,990.15 FILED BY BAIR, STEVEN AS TO DEFENDANT ROGER QUIRING DBA QUIRING PROPERTIES, PALM COURT A T CARL ST. LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JUL-16-2010 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.