Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jimenez, Guillermo, filed a(n) Money case against Ortega, Richard M. 33309 -, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2009 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-03-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR, NO APPEARANCE(S). JUDGE PRO TEM: SASHA CUMMINGS. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
August 03, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUN-08-2009 - CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION TO AUG-03-2009 AT 6:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID MCDONALD. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
June 08, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED MAY-15-2009, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT ORTEGA, RICHARD M. | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF JIMENEZ, GUILLERMO AS TO DEFENDANT ORTEGA, RICHARD M. | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,500.00 FILED BY JIMENEZ, GUILLERMO AS TO DEFENDANT ORTEGA, RICHARD M. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JUN-08-2009 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.