Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Maniwa, Kaz, filed a(n) Money case against Bank Of America, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2009 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF MANIWA, KAZ | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MANIWA, KAZ IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA [SEE JUDGMENT AT LENGTH] STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUN-29-2009 - JUDGMENT. (CLERK: V. MU IN ROOM 103) | |
June 29, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUN-29-2009 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUN-29-2009 BY JUDGE PRO TEM: BRAD KAPLAN. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. EXHIBITS RETAINED. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PRO TEM BRAD KAPLAN FILED BY MANIWA, KAZ BANK OF AMERICA | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA | |
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE IS "GRANTED", PER JUDGE PRO TEM BRADLEY KAPLAN. COPY MAILED TO PARTIES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.