Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thai, Duy, filed a(n) Money case against Chan, Beson, Cheung, Kim Fung, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with PAUL SLAVIT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2009 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PER THE PLAINTIFF, UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANT. DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. JUDGE PRO TEM: BRAD KAPLAN. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
May 05, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-05-2009 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO JUN-02-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506 | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF THAI, DUY | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF THAI, DUY | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-03-2009 - CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION TO MAY-05-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. JUDGE PRO TEM: JEAN MILEFF. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506). | |
March 03, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PRO TEM JEAN MILEFF FILED BY THAI, DUY | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED JAN-12-2009, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT CHEUNG, KIM FUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.