Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bystrom, Lotta, filed a(n) Money case against Johansson, Lars, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Slavit Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2008 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time266 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2009ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING
Date: January 27, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED MAY-01-2009 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT JOHANSSON, LARS | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BYSTROM, LOTTA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT JOHANSSON, LARS $1,871.60 PRINCIPAL, $109.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,980.60 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF FEB-23-2009 - JUDGMENT. | |
February 23, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF FEB-23-2009 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF FEB-23-2009 BY PAUL SLAVIT. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. EXHIBITS RETAINED. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506). | |
February 02, 2009 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF FEB-02-2009 - CONTINUED ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING TO FEB-23-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506 | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.