Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Appleby, Robert J., filed a(n) Money case against Tri-State Appliance Corp, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time292 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2007 | Hearing |
MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event | SC MOTION DISPOSITION MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF OCT-03-2007, DENIED | |
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRI-STATE APPLIANCE CORP HEARING SET FOR OCT-03-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED SENT TO DEFT. INCORRECT ADDRESS. | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION:TO CHANGE DEFT'S MAILING ADDRESS. | |
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
March 13, 2007 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF APPLEBY, ROBERT J. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TRI-STATE APPLIANCE CORP $3,150.00 PRINCIPAL, $80.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,230.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
February 20, 2007 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT TRI-STATE APPLIANCE CORP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.