Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Enea, Josefina, filed a(n) Money case against Kaiser Permanente, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2006 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2006 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE (MCPHAIL, PAULA) CLAIM HEARING OF JUL-05-2006 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED | |
May 26, 2006 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION MAY-26-2006, CONTINUED BY COURT TO JUL-05-2006 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 ORDER GRANTED. | |
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFT'S CONTC ORDER REQUEST FILED;TO FOLDER/TRAY. | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | CERT MAIL RETURNED SIGNED SENT TO PAUL MCPHAIL, KAISER HOSPITAL. | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | CLERK COULD HARDLY READ THE CLAIM, TOLD LITIGANT TO GO TO RM.208 FOR HELP TO REWRITE CLAIM LEGIBLY BUT SHE REFUSED. | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY ENEA, JOSEFINA AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE (MCPHAIL, PAULA) ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAY-26-2006 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.