Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Exline, Dawn M., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Zobkiw, Laura M., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2006 |
CategoryAuto Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2006 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION MAY-23-2006, OFF CALENDAR | |
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT ZOBKIW, LAURA M. | |
April 24, 2006 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF SIGNED A DECLARATION, DEFENDANT NOT SERVED. | |
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | TRIAL RESET TO MAY-23-2006 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF APR-24-2006 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,500.00 FILED BY EXLINE, DAWN M. AS TO DEFENDANT ZOBKIW, LAURA M. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-24-2006 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.