Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Breining, Christopher P., filed a(n) Money case against East Star Building Supply Co., Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2005 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR RETURNED FROM SUPERIOR COURT | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | APPEAL DISMISSED, NO APPEARANCE BY ANY PARTY | |
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT EAST STAR BUILDING SUPPLY CO., INC. | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, APPELLATE NUMBER 28065, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT EAST STAR BUILDING SUPPLY CO., INC. | |
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
December 05, 2005 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BREINING, CHRISTOPHER P. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT EAST STAR BUILDING SUPPLY CO., INC. $5,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $77.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,077.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
November 18, 2005 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.