Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valenta, Jerome F., Valenta, Jennifer, filed a(n) Money case against E Green Construction Inc. Dba E G Construction, City And County Of San Francisco, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2005 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time241 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | PLTFF'S EXHIBITS RETURNED. | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
January 26, 2006 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF VALENTA, JEROME F. VALENTA, JENNIFER IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO PLIANTIFF MAY RESET AND SERVE REMAINING DEFENDANT E. GREEN CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA E. G. CONSTRUCTION. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
December 15, 2005 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION DEC-15-2005, CONTINUED BY COURT TO JAN-26-2006 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 CONTINUED FOR FURTHER TRIAL BY AGREEMENTS OF THE PARTIES. | |
November 14, 2005 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING-REFUSED BY TAX COLLECTOR'S OFFICE. | |
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION NOV-14-2005, CONTINUANCE ORDERED PER REQUEST TO DEC-15-2005 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.