Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
City & County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Money case against Yu, Yan Xiu, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2003 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2003 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
August 18, 2003 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF AS TO DEFENDANT YU, YAN XIU CLAIM HEARING OF AUG-29-2003 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED | |
July 25, 2003 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
July 25, 2003 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION JUL-25-2003, CONTINUED BY COURT TO AUG-29-2003 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 PER PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. | |
April 24, 2003 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
April 24, 2003 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION APR-24-2003, CONTINUED BY COURT TO JUL-25-2003 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 PER PLTF'S REQUEST. | |
March 20, 2003 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
March 20, 2003 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION MAR-20-2003, CONTINUED BY COURT TO APR-24-2003 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 PER PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. | |
February 26, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT YU, YAN XIU | |
January 31, 2003 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO OFFICE OF THE TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT YU, YAN XIU ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-20-2003 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.