Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Fuertsch, Charles M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFuertsch, Charles M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2015 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HRG BY MAIL SRV ON 05/22/18 AS TO DENISE L CHAVEZ, FILED. | |
May 18, 2018 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(040518) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) CHARLES M FUERTSCH,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE HOLT NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: JOHN DEEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ALAN SKIDMORE PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DENISE L CHAVEZ - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT. MOTION FILED 04/05/18 BY THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. THE COURT DOES ACCEPT AND APPROVE ORDER AFTER HEARING. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 18, 2018 | Hearing | Order After Hearing Filed Comment ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 05/18/18 IN DEPT CS2. | |
May 18, 2018 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Judicial Officer Fuertsch, Charles M Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(040518) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
April 05, 2018 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(040518) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
June 17, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment and Proof of Service (Gov) Filed Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) FILED. | |
June 01, 2015 | Hearing | Judgment After Trial on Governmental Complaint Comment JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING/TRIAL ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. JUDGMENT ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 05/27/15 JUDGMENT FOR: THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO JUDGMENT AGAINST: DENISE L CHAVEZ COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) | |
May 27, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Anderson, Diane I Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT/CS/HC/MEDICAL(042815) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) DIANE I ANDERSON,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JACQUELINE HOLT COURT REPORTER SHARON POSEY;12835 BAILIFF: A SERRANO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DAN BELL PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DENISE L CHAVEZ - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN RE: JUDGT CS/HLTH CARE/50% UNREIMB MED/JOINDER. MOTION FILED 04/28/15 BY THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. INITIAL HEARING HELD. THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S MOTION RE JUDGT CS/HLTH CARE/50% UNREIMB MEDICAL/JOINDER IS GRANTED. INITIAL HEARING HELD. THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S MOTION RE JUDGT CS/HLTH CARE/50% UNREIMB MEDICAL/JOINDER IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT ENTERED COURT ORDERS DENISE L CHAVEZ TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT $$33.00 FOR CHILD ABIGAIL L CARRILLO DOB: 08/07/99. COURT ORDERS DENISE L CHAVEZ TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT $$55.00 FOR CHILD NOEMI CHAVEZ DOB: 12/27/01. THE COURT ORDERS DENISE L CHAVEZ TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT FOR A TOTAL OF $$88.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLEON THE 1ST DAY OF EACH MONTH COMMENCING 06/01/15 AND CONTINUING UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED. THIS IS A SUPPORT ORDER THAT MOTHER IS UNDER AN OBLIGATION TO PAY. CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES IS ORDERED TO ENFORCE BY WAGE ASSIGNMENT, PURSUANT TO FC5230 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO OTHER MEANS OF COLLECTION AND ENFORCEMENT PURSUANT TO RTC19271(E)(3). ALL PAYMENTS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE PAID THROUGH THE CA STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT, PO BOX 989067,WEST SACRAMENTO, CA 95798-9067. - LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT: THE SUPPORT ORDER WAS REDUCED PURSUANT TO THE LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT, BECAUSE THE OBLIGOR'S NET MONTHLY INCOME IS LESS THAN THE STATUTORY GUIDELINE AMOUNT. - MOTHER IS ORDERED TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE FOR THE MINOR CHILD(REN) IF IT IS AVAILABLE AT NO OR REASONABLE COST PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3751. HAVING MADE THE FINDING THAT THE LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT APPLIES TO THE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER THE COURT FINDS THAT HEALTH INSURANCE IS NOT CURRENTLY REASONABLY AVAILABLE TO THE OBLIGOR (MOTHER) PURSUANT TO FC3751. - THE COURT ORDERS DENISE L CHAVEZ PROVIDE CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES WITH ANY CHANGE OF ADDRESS, PLACE OF EMPLOYMENT, OR LEVEL OF INCOME WITHIN 10 DAYS OF SUCH CHANGE. THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION IN THE MATTER. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 27, 2015 | Hearing | Attachment to Minute Order Comment ATTACHMENT TO 05/27/15 MINUTE ORDER | |
May 27, 2015 | Hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Judicial Officer Anderson, Diane I Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT/CS/HC/MEDICAL(042815) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.