Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Fuertsch, Charles M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryGovernmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2019 | Hearing | Confirmation of Ntc of Registration of CA Sppt Order Filed Comment CONFIRMATION OF NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER FILED IN YUBA COUNTY UNDER CASE CVFS19-0000119. | |
December 29, 2016 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment CONR FROM SUTTER CO IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON STATEMENT #1 AND #3 ARE BLANK . | |
January 17, 2014 | Hearing | Update Jurisdiction to Comment UPDATE JURISDICTION TO KS. | |
November 26, 2013 | Hearing | Document(s) Placed in File Comment NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CA SUPPORT ORDER REGISTE RED IN BUTTE COUNTY DFL028234 PLACED IN FILE | |
November 18, 2013 | Hearing | Request for Order Filed re: Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY MONICA E AVALOS PINA RE: (111513)CC/CV/RETURN CHILD-OFF CALENDAR. | |
November 15, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Bennett, Teresa S Comment EX-PARTE RFO RE: CC/CV/RTRN OF CHILD FILED BY MONICA E AVALOS PINA TERESA S BENNETT,JUDGE CLERK: ANGIE HICKAM NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. - OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 15, 2013 | Hearing | Ex Parte Hearing Original Type Ex Parte Hearing Judicial Officer Bennett, Teresa S Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment EX-PARTE RFO RE: CC/CV/RTRN OF CHILD FILED BY MONICA E AVALOS PINA | |
November 14, 2013 | Hearing | Update Jurisdiction to Comment UPDATE JURISDICTION TO RS. | |
November 08, 2013 | Hearing | Filing Fee Waived for Comment FILING FEE WAIVED ON MONICA E AVALOS PINA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE XP IN THE AMOUNT OF $495.00. | |
November 08, 2013 | Hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MONICA E AVALOS PINA IS GRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.