Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Israel Pace, Pace, Israel, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Reeves, Dawna F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Surrender | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review Hearing
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.