Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Daniel Wayne Steffens, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Reeves, Dawna F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.