Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rudolfo Delreal, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review Hearing
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Second-Strike Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.