Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mcabee, Stephanie Nicole, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Reeves, Dawna F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.