Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ackerman, Rodney, Rodney Ackerman, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Fees Sent To Collections | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | POTF at Disposition | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Investigation Report | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Criminal Protective Order-Modified | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Sentenced |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.