Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Guillermo Jose Ornelas, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Misd Dui/14601 |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Recalled | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Calendar Request | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Mewhinney, Douglas V |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.