Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Abraham Lincoln High School Of San Francisco, Balboa High School Alumni Association, Burton, John, George Washington High School Alumni Assciation, Lowell Alumni Association, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen case against Matthews, Vincent, San Francisco Board Of Education, San Francisco Unified School District, represented by Solomon, Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryWrits Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint document is a court order dismissing a first amended petition for a writ of mandate in the case of Abraham Lincoln High School Alumni Association, San Francisco Taxpayers Association, George Washington High School Alumni Association, L...
ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: March 18, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-29-2021 9:30 AM
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR ADDITIONAL TIME SPENT ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PAUL D. SCOTT RE FEES FOR WORK ON FEES AND COSTS MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67008957) FILED BY PETITIONER ABRAHAM LINCOLN HIGH SCHOOL OF SAN FRANCISCO ALUMNI ASSOCIATION SAN FRANCISCO TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION GEORGE WASHINGTON HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI ASSCIATION BURTON, JOHN SAKATA, KAREN SHIGEZUMI LOWELL ALUMNI ASSOCIATION BALBOA HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI ASSOCIATION MISSION HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI ASSOCIATION | |
September 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on calendar for Wednesday, September 29, 2021, Line 2, PETITIONERS ABRAHAM LINCOLN HIGH SCHOOL OF SAN FRANCISCO, SAN FRANCISCO TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, GEORGE WASHINGTON HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI ASSCIA... | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR SEP-29-2021 9:30 AM | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS | |
September 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion To Strike ,Or In The Alternative Tax Costs Sought By Petitioners **Court Reporter Fees Paid** (Transaction Id # 100135983) (Transaction Id # 100135983)
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
September 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-29-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES. PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SEC. 1021.5 IS GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF 59,027.00. RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS IS DENIED, AND PETITIONERS ARE AWARDED $1,209 IN COSTS. PETITIONERS ARE ALSO ENTITLED TO AN AWARD OF "FEES ON FEES" FOR TIME SPENT IN CONNECTION WITH THE INSTANT MOTIONS. (KETCHUM V. MOSES (2001) 24 CAL.4TH 1122, 1133.) PETITIONERS SHALL, WITHIN 10 DAYS, FILE A DECLARATION OF COUNSEL DETAILING THE TIME SPENT IN CONNECTION WITH THE FEES AND COSTS MOTIONS, COUNSEL'S REASONABLE HOURLY RATES, AND THE TOTAL AMOUNT SOUGHT. (SEE WORD MINUTES FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER IS TO SUBMIT A SEPERATE PROPOSED ORDER AWARDING PETITIONERS FEES ON FEES, IN AN AMOUNT TO BE DETERMINED TO CONTESTDEPT302TR@SFTC.ORG. ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS IS SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: W. TRUPEK, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO CSR# 8600, EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. (302/EPS) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX COSTS SOUGHT BY PETITIONERS (ADDED TO CALENDAR PER COURT'S ORDER ON 8/4/21; SEE 8/4/21 MINI-MINUTES) IS DENIED. (PLEASE SEE RULING AND WORD MINUTES RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR FULL DETIALS) THE ORDER SIGNED ON PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES PERTAINS TO THIS MOTION. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: W. TRUPEK, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO CSR# 8600, EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. (302/EPS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.