Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Service Employees Interlational Union, Local 1021, filed a(n) Compel Arbitration - Arbitration case against City And County Of San Francisco, City & County Of San Francisco, represented by Mangoba, Cecilia T, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2019 |
CategoryPetition Re: Arbitration (Petition To Compel Arbitration Award) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCompel Arbitration |
Case Cycle Time171 days |
MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2019 9:30 AM
Date: August 06, 2019ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 06, 2019ORDER GRANTING COSTS TO PETITIONER
Date: November 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING COSTS TO PETITIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 64457416) FILED BY PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERLATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021 | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING COSTS TO PETITIONER | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $867.19 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE SEP-12-2019,, (TRANSACTION ID # 64128358) FILED BY PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERLATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021 | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 64080951) FILED BY PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERLATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021 | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2019 9:30 AM | |
August 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Compel Arbitration
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, DEPT. 302, THE COURT ADOPTED THE TENTATIVE RULING ON PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AS FOLLOWS: PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: MARIA A. TORREANO CSR#8600, EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM (302/EPS) | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63641246) FILED BY PETITIONER SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERLATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 1021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.