Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Corkery, Patrick, filed a(n) Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen case represented by Rotwein, Geoffrey, against Department Of Motor Vehicles, Gordon, Steve, Shiomoto, Jean, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2019 |
CategoryWrits Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A159463 DIV 3
Date: October 28, 2021CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 04, 2020CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL. A159463 DIV. 3 [PLEASE SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS]
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64326894)
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER DENYING PETITIONER PATRICK CORKERY'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER DENYING PETITIONER PATRICK CORKERY'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 30, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64666844) FILED BY APPELLANT CORKERY, PATRICK
Date: January 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A159463 DIV 3 | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 1 VOL CT, 2 VOLS RT [APPEAL FILED 1/28/20, A159463 DIV 3] | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 65713497) BY APPELLANT CORKERY, PATRICK | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $200.00 [$300.00, LESS $100.00] | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $775.00 RE 36283 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO COURT OF APPEAL, DOC#1910506821, WARRANT #38206329, DATED MAY-18-2020 | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL. A159463 DIV. 3 [PLEASE SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS] | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64666844) FILED BY APPELLANT CORKERY, PATRICK | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64666844) FILED BY APPELLANT CORKERY, PATRICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.