Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Winfred M.D, Rajeev Isaac, filed a(n) Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen case against Medical Board Of California, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEthan P. Schulman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2018 |
CategoryWrits Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time161 days |
ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE
Date: March 18, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED
Date: March 27, 2019ORDER RE: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE
Date: March 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT GRANTING WRIT OF MANDAMUS. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. FIRESTONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100043839) FILED BY PETITIONER WINFRED M.D, RAJEEV ISAAC | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE | |
March 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Hearing For Writ Of Administrative Mandate
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PETITIONER RAJEEV WINFRED'S HEARING FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE. TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. (AS FULLY REPORTED IN THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT). JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: S. LE, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. =(302/EPS) ***ORDER GRANTING PETITION SIGNED AFTER HEARING. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)*** | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-18-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO RESPONDENTS WRIT OF MANDATE (TRANSACTION ID # 100042873) FILED BY PETITIONER WINFRED M.D, RAJEEV ISAAC | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDING (TRANSACTION ID # 100042873) FILED BY PETITIONER WINFRED M.D, RAJEEV ISAAC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.