Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stein, James M., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Poulson, Richard H., against Firenze Fine Arts Inc, Firenze Fine Arts, Inc., represented by Poole, Edward Gray, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time145 days |
DECLARATION (CALCULATION OF INTERESTS) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEIN, JAMES M.
Date: October 27, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60236544) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC.
Date: February 21, 2017ORDER ON DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT Set for hearing for Tuesday, March 21, 2017, line 1. DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC'S MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT. Defendant Firenze Fine Arts, Inc.'s m...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
March 21, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC. MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT ENTERED ON OCTOBER 27, 2016 IS GRANTED. THE MARYLAND COURT LACKED PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER FIRENZE. NEITHER LUBERSKI, INC. V. OLEFICIO F.LLI AMATO, S.R.L. (2009) 171 CAL. APP. 4TH 409 NOR ANY OTHER CASE HOLDS THAT A ONE-TIME MAILING OF GOODS TO AN OUT-OF-STATE ADDRESS AFTER THE GOODS WERE PURCHASED IN AN ENTIRELY IN-STATE TRANSACTION IS SUFFICIENT TO WARRANT IMPOSITION OF SPECIFIC PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THE MAILER BY THE STATE TO WHOM THE GOODS WERE MAILED. A RECENT UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT DECISION ON SPECIFIC JURISDICTION STRONGLY SUGGESTS THAT SPECIFIC JURISDICTION DOES NOT LIE UNDER THESE CIRCUMSTANCES. (WALDEN V. FIORE (2014) 134 S.CT. 1115.). ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: FELICIA GREEN; COURT REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR NO. 8189, EMAIL: CKAREN@SFTC.ORG; DEPT. 302. | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-21-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS INCS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60336789) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC. | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT, JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 1710.25 FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEIN, JAMES M. SERVED FEB-05-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC. | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC.'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; PROPOSED ORDER. FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEIN, JAMES M. | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEIN, JAMES M. | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC.S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRENZE FINE ARTS, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.