Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City And County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) Summary Judgment case represented by Profitt, Stephanie, against Angelico, Antonio, Farina Focaccia Cucina Italiana, Llc, Farina Foods, Llc, Global Trading & Marketing Llc, Minna, Luca, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2015 |
CategorySummary Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time382 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $15,723.61 AS TO DEFENDANT GLOBAL TRADING & MARKETING LLC | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $97.75 AS TO DEFENDANT FARINA FOCACCIA CUCINA ITALIANA, LLC | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT GLOBAL TRADING & MARKETING LLC | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $775.12 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 57895952) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT FARINA FOCACCIA CUCINA ITALIANA, LLC | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $88.00 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 57490221) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57461808) | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FARINA FOCACCIA CUCINA ITALIANA, LLC ANGELICO, ANTONIO AN INDIVIDUAL MINNA, LUCA AN INDIVIDUAL FARINA FOODS, LLC GLOBAL TRADING & MARKETING LLC $18,397.04 PRINCIPAL, $8,872.24 INTEREST, $4,880.51 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $32,149.79, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT FARINA FOCACCIA CUCINA ITALIANA, LLC ANGELICO, ANTONIO AN INDIVIDUAL MINNA, LUCA AN INDIVIDUAL FARINA FOODS, LLC GLOBAL TRADING & MARKETING LLC JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.