Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doe Jr, Jon Po Box, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Agho, Andrea, Akhidneor, Charles, Martin, Linda, Perez, Frank, San Francisco Housing Authority, (total of 8) See All represented by Diamond, James Thomas, Lee, Randall Jayman, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Lynn O'Malley Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions124 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1434 days |
This complaint is a reply to a notice of motion for clarification in a legal case between Jon Doe Jr and Charles Akhidneor et al. The complaint seeks clarification from the court on whether the court excused Doe's lateness in filing the second amende...
OPPOSITION TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: February 04, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: February 02, 2015ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY UNDER CCP SECTION 1094.5(G)
Date: October 06, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: October 08, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: November 10, 2014AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: June 18, 2014OBJECTION TO PLTF'S REQ. FOR JUDICIAL NTC FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY
Date: February 21, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: December 30, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: January 08, 2014ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: March 11, 2014ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2014ORDER SUPPLEMENTING RECORD
Date: January 10, 2014REPLY FOR MTN FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: January 08, 2014DECLARATION OF DOE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: January 08, 2014MINUTES FOR APR-08-2015 9:00 AM
Date: April 08, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOE JR, JON
Date: December 18, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY RESPONDENT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY
Date: December 11, 2013DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: December 18, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY RESPONDENT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY
Date: December 11, 2013ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT.
Date: December 17, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8/12/15)
Date: August 21, 2015CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: September 15, 2015CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: July 10, 2015ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR REHEARING A144456, A146029 DIV 4
Date: September 13, 2017ORDER FROM COA GRANTING APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, ETAL A146029 DIV 4
Date: September 11, 2015CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2015CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE STATUS OF APPEAL
Date: April 28, 2015OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR CLARIFICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT AKHIDNEOR, CHARLES
Date: July 16, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: July 07, 2014NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT DOE JR, JON
Date: March 10, 2015CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 06, 2015DECLARATION OF DOE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: March 17, 2015DECLARATION (DOE'S DECLARATION) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: February 04, 2015DECLARATION OF JOHN DOE FILED BY PETITIONER DOE JR, JON
Date: January 12, 2015DECLARATION OF DOE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: February 17, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOE JR, JON
Date: January 12, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: September 12, 2014REPLY FOR MOTION FOR STAY UNDER COO SEC 1094.5(G) AND MEMO FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: September 15, 2014ORDER (CONTINUING HEARING DATE)
Date: July 24, 2014DECLARATION OF JOHN DOE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: September 15, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: July 08, 2014ORDER OVERRULING RESPONDENTS' DEMURRER
Date: August 07, 2014DOE'S DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: August 20, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-28-2014 9:00 AM
Date: January 28, 2014REPLY FOR MTN FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: January 14, 2014DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: January 14, 2014NOTICE OF THIRD MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: March 17, 2015SECOND MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: March 17, 2015NOTICE OF FIRST MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: March 17, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON
Date: February 27, 2015TENTATIVE RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: March 24, 2015EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO MOVE UNDER SEAL FILED BY PETITIONER DOE JR, JON
Date: February 18, 2015ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO MOVE UNDER SEAL
Date: February 18, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER DOE JR, JON
Date: February 18, 2015EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO MOVE UNDER SEAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: February 17, 2015OPPOSITION TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE JR, JON
Date: April 02, 2015REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 02, 2015ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: April 14, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 0) FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON
Date: June 08, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57413700)
Date: June 16, 2015REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A144456 DIV 4 & A146029 DIV 4
Date: October 18, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON
Date: August 12, 2015NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (8.124, NO RT) FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON
Date: August 12, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A144456 DIV 4 & A146029 DIV 4 | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR REHEARING A144456, A146029 DIV 4 | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, NO RT (APPEAL FILED 8/12/15, A146029 DIV 4) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM COA GRANTING APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, ETAL A146029 DIV 4 | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8/12/15) | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (8.124, NO RT) FILED BY APPELLANT DOE JR, JON | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, NO RT (APPEAL FILED 6/8/15, A144456 DIV 4) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.