Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Litchenberger, Cristina, Redmond, Jane, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Keys, Michael David, against California Department Of Health Care Services, California Dept Of Health Care Services, Does 1 To 20, Douglas, Toby, Toby Douglas Director, California Department Of, (total of 5) See All represented by Addams, Jennifer C, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold E. Kahn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1960 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1960 days |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: April 10, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100007576) FILED BY ATTORNEY KEYS, MICHAEL DAVID
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100057340) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING DECISION (TRANSACTION ID # 61866047) FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES | |
April 10, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Fees Set for hearing for Monday, April 10, 2017, Line 1, PETITIONERs CRISTINA LITCHENBERGER, JANE REDMOND's Motion For Attorneys Fees. Petitioners Christina L...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
April 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Attorneys Fees
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, PETITIONERS CHRISTINA LITCHENBERGER AND JANE REDMOND'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: LAURA A. REDING, CSR 711 =302/HK | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-10-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL KEYS IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100013422) FILED BY PETITIONER LITCHENBERGER, CRISTINA REDMOND, JANE | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. ROTHSCHILD IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100013422) (TRANSACTION ID # 100013422) FILED BY PETITIONER LITCHENBERGER, CRISTINA REDMOND, JANE | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013422) FILED BY PETITIONER LITCHENBERGER, CRISTINA REDMOND, JANE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.