Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Landsman Md, Henry, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Medical Board Of California, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Marla J. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions357 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time692 days |
This complaint is filed by Henry Landsman MD FACEP against the Medical Board of California. The complaint is about the sentence that Henry Landsman received due to a broken wrist case. He claims that a powerful Colonel's feelings were hurt under inte...
NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: August 20, 2013ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL REMITTITUR A139529 DIV 3
Date: May 28, 2014REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A139529 DIV 3)
Date: November 14, 2013THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: August 08, 2013ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS
Date: August 08, 2013ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A139529 DIV 3)
Date: September 13, 2013AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY PETITIONER LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP
Date: August 19, 2013MOTION FOR STAY FILED BY PETITIONER LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP
Date: May 14, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP
Date: April 11, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 19, 2013ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON JUN-27-2013 (ALL MOTIONS ARE DENIED)
Date: July 15, 2013MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY PETITIONER LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP
Date: May 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL REMITTITUR A139529 DIV 3 | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A139529 DIV 3) | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A139529 DIV 3) | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY PETITIONER LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | FEES FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 8/6/13 | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY PETITIONER LANDSMAN MD, HENRY FACEP | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS FILED BY RESPONDENT MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.