Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Oakland, Yew, Joseph, County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Civil Petitions case represented by Brosnahan, Brian Paul, Winnie, Richard Edward, against City Of Oakland, Nolan, William E., Yew, Joseph, Does 1 To 10, represented by Russo, John A., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with James J. McBride presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management325 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2011 |
CategoryOther Civil Petitions |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions237 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time525 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Date: April 12, 2012AMENDED ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: February 08, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Date: March 11, 2011STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CMC FILED BY COUNTY OF ALAMEDA CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: January 11, 2012OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: March 22, 2012ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: January 27, 2012SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: February 07, 2012ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2012CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (CCP 1013A(4))
Date: April 09, 2012MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 220
Date: June 30, 2011DECLARATION OF KEVIN D SIEGEL FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: March 22, 2012MINUTES FOR APR-05-2012 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220
Date: April 05, 2012CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Date: November 30, 2011SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Date: December 05, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY OF OAKLAND
Date: November 30, 2011ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: March 16, 2011DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Date: March 09, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2012 | Hearing | JURY TRIAL | |
August 20, 2012 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-06-2012 - VACATED. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WAS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ON JUNE 21, 2012. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. | |
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-20-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - OFF CALENDAR. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WAS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ON JUNE 21, 2012. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. | |
June 27, 2012 | Hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-27-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WAS FILED ON JUNE 21, 2012. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. | |
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING SET FOR JUN-27-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 220 | |
May 16, 2012 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-16-2012 - CONFERENCE HELD. MATTER IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 27, 2012 @ 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NOTICE WAIVED. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.