Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Clifford Gregory Escobar,, Clifford Gregory Escobar, Individually, Does 1 Thru 10, Incl., Escobar, Catherine Joy, Escobar & Escobar Concrete Construction, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryPetition Re: Arbitration |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1525 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Case Cycle Time1525 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 56821974)
Date: February 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 56821974) | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO CLIFFORD GREGORY ESCOBAR DBA ESCOBAR & ESCOBAR FILED BY PETITIONER CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ON BEHALF OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO CATHERINE JOY ESCOBAR FILED BY PETITIONER CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ON BEHALF OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO ESCOBAR & ESCOBAR CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION FILED BY PETITIONER CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ON BEHALF OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO CLIFFORD GREGORY ESCOBAR FILED BY PETITIONER CARPENTERS 46 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COUNTIES CONFERENCE BOARD ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND ON BEHALF OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL | |
April 06, 2011 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Index Of Federal Authorities
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 301, NTC OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND INDEX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES, OFF CALENDAR FOR APRIL 6, 2011 PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY. | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON DEDENDANT CATHERINE JOY ESCOBAR INDIVIDUAL AS FOLLOWS: DOCUMENTS: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ; NOTICE OF HEARING ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, INDEX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES; | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON DEDENDANT CLIFFORD GREGGORY ESCOBAR INDIVIDUALLY AS FOLLOWS: DOCUMENTS: OF CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ; NOTICE OF HEARING ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, INDEX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES; | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON DEDENDANT CATHERINE JOY ESCOBAR INDIVIDUAL AND DBA AS ESCOBAR & ESCOBAR CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION AS FOLLOWS: DOCUMENTS: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ; NOTICE OF HEARING ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, INDEX OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.