Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Ridge Apts. Holding Company, Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Bradford G, Witkow, Brandon J., against Keener, Mark S., Tra Real Estate Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 20, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
|
Case Cycle Time2883 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT TRA REAL ESTATE LLC KEENER, MARK S. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT TRA REAL ESTATE LLC KEENER, MARK S. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL BANK OF AMERICA TO HONOR NOTICE OF LEVY AND SANCTIONS UNDER CCP SECTION 701.020 | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 302, PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED ON AUGUST 3, 2016, PLAINTIFF RIDGE APTS. HOLDING COMPANY, LLC MOTION TO COMPEL BANK OF AMERICA TO HONOR NOTICE OF LEVY & SANCTIONS UNDER CCP 701.020 - SEE RULING FOR DETAILS. JUDGE PRO-TEM: DAVID MANGINI | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
August 03, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion To Compel Bank Of America To Honor Notice Of Levy & Sanctions Under Ccp ? 701.020 Matter on calendar for Wednesday, August 3, 2016, Line 1, PLAINTIFF RIDGE APTS. HOLDING COMPANY, LLC Motion To ...
Judge: David Mangini |
|
August 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Continuance Of Motion To Compel Bank Of America To Honor Notice Of Levy & Sanctions Under Ccp ? 701.020
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion To Compel Bank Of America To Honor Notice Of Levy & Sanctions Under Ccp ? 701.020
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-03-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY, 302, NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL BANK OF AMERICA TO HONOR NOTICE OF LEVY & SANCTIONS UNDER CCP ? 701.020 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AS DUPLICATE ENTRY. (D302) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.