Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Herrera, Fernando, filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case represented by Labor Commissioner, State Of California, against Picasso, Luis Alfredo, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Bruce E. Chan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce E. Chan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2008 |
CategoryLabor Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
Case Cycle Time363 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL POST JUDGMENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS | |
December 19, 2008 | Hearing |
Mo To Compel Answers To Post-Judgment Disco
Judge: BRUCE E. CHAN |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 610, ASSIGNEE CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POST JUDGMENT DISCOVERY IS GRANTED. MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $340 SHALL BE PAID WITHIN 21 DAYS OF NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. PREVAILING PARTY TO SUBMIT FORM OF ORDER. COMMISSIONER: BRUCE CHAN. NOT REPORTED. | |
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-19-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | MO TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO POST-JUDGMENT DISCO, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY ASSIGNEE CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC. DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2008 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC. DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU AS TO DEFENDANT PICASSO, LUIS ALFREDO AN INDIVIDUAL | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HERRERA, FERNANDO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PICASSO, LUIS ALFREDO AN INDIVIDUAL $5,057.92 PRINCIPAL, $44.17 INTEREST, $180.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,282.09, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERRERA, FERNANDO AS TO DEFENDANT PICASSO, LUIS ALFREDO AN INDIVIDUAL JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.