Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Liang, Lilliam, Liang, Lillian, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Residential Rent Stabilization And Arbitration Boa, San Francisco Residential Rent Stabilization And, represented by Dickey, Kevin Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2003 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ORDER SUSTAINING RESPONDENT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2004ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A107910 #4)
Date: March 23, 2005MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2004 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 305
Date: March 26, 2004ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS, ETAL (A107910 #4)
Date: November 29, 2004ORDER TAKING MOTION FOR PREEMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE OFF CALENDAR.
Date: December 10, 2004NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT (NTC OF APPEAL ONLY) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIANG, LILLIAN
Date: September 14, 2004MINUTES FOR APR-30-2004 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 305
Date: May 03, 2004ORDER VACATING COURT'S ORDER OF NOV. 21, 2003
Date: May 19, 2004Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER RE: TAKING OFF CALENDAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THE INTERESTED PARTY. | |
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THE INTEREST PARTY - LANDLORD TERRIE TZENG & TOMMY LEE; REQUESTING FOR COURT JUDGMENT, OFF CALENDAR. | |
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A107910 #4) | |
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER TAKING MOTION FOR PREEMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE OFF CALENDAR. | |
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS, ETAL (A107910 #4) | |
October 13, 2004 | Docket Event | REQ TO COA FOR DISMISSAL OF APPEAL | |
September 30, 2004 | Tentative Ruling |
Re-Notice Of Hearing For Mtn For Peremptory Writ Of Mandate OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.(302/REQ)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 30, 2004 | Hearing |
Re-Notice Of Hearing For Mtn For Peremptory Writ Of Mandate
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFF LILLIAM LIANG RE-NOTICE OF HEARING FOR MTN FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE. OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT. HON. RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. REPORTER: BELDON YEE, CSR #2647. | |
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR SEP-30-2004 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.