Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coast Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by In Pro Per, Pro Per, against Melania Velasquez, Melanie Patterson, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Eric V. Isaac presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing
Date: January 04, 2021Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: BETTY VILLEGAS
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims
Date: February 24, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 04, 2021Declaration of Non-Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance re: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING set on 01/04/21 at 1:30 in Department MV2.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of COAST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Small Claims Hearing - Moreno Valley
Date: January 04, 2021Plaintiff's Claim filed (More than 12 Per Year). (Corona)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Authorization to Appear (SC-109). Authorized to appear: Betty Villegas
Date: January 04, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.