Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Anticouni & Associates, Casillas, Graciela, Chavez, Leo, Coleman, Alyssa M, Cubias, Jose, (total of 20) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Bradley, Marcus J, Carter, Roger R, Clapp, James F, Cooper, Scott B, Gearinger, Brian, (total of 13) See All against Carl Karcher Enterprises Inc, Carl Karcher Wage And Hour Cases Ii, Cke Restaurants Inc, Hour Cases Ii, Wage, Carl Karcher, (total of 5) See All represented by Case, Hope Anne, Ferrell, Scott J, Llaguno, Fermin H, Sacks, Luanne, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions769 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1834 days |
Carl Karcher - Hyte Dec Re Disbursement
Date: May 31, 2022Carl Karcher - Final Accounting Stmt
Date: May 31, 2022Order, Filed
Date: March 17, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Order, Filed
Date: April 25, 2008Response, Filed
Date: April 25, 2008Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 04, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 11, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: December 18, 2006Response, Filed
Date: February 21, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 25, 2007Response, Filed
Date: June 10, 2008Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 12, 2007Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 29, 2007Order, Filed
Date: June 21, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: December 13, 2005Stipulation, Filed
Date: January 10, 2007Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 15, 2007Petition, Filed
Date: April 25, 2008Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 23, 2007Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 18, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 09, 2006Brief, Filed
Date: July 18, 2008Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 09, 2007Opposition, Filed
Date: August 16, 2008Stipulation, Filed
Date: August 31, 2007Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 19, 2008Objection, Filed
Date: August 26, 2008Petition, Filed
Date: March 07, 2008Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 12, 2008Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 29, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: April 25, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: April 25, 2008Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 23, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 17, 2008Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: April 01, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 16, 2007Ruling, Filed
Date: March 08, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 04, 2008Stipulation, Filed
Date: December 26, 2007Stipulation, Filed
Date: November 06, 2007Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 30, 2007Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 12, 2007Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 11, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 26, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 12, 2007Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 19, 2007Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 08, 2006Statement, Filed
Date: January 02, 2007Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 16, 2007Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 01, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 14, 2006Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 27, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 08, 2007Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 27, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 15, 2005Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: December 27, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 02, 2007Statement, Filed
Date: December 18, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 10, 2006Application, Filed
Date: June 20, 2006Stipulation, Filed
Date: June 21, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 20, 2005Answer, Filed
Date: March 23, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 16, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 01, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: February 21, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 28, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 22, 2006Objection, Filed
Date: February 21, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 15, 2005Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: February 21, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 13, 2006Objection, Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: January 25, 2006Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: September 15, 2005Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 25, 2006Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 25, 2006Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: January 24, 2006Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: January 25, 2006Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: January 03, 2006Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: January 24, 2006Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 29, 2005Ruling, Filed
Date: December 22, 2005Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: December 13, 2005Opposition, Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Opposition, Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: November 15, 2005Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: December 05, 2005Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: November 15, 2005Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: September 15, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Carl Karcher - Hyte Dec Re Disbursement | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Carl Karcher - Final Accounting Stmt | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
April 27, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Approval Attorneys Plaintiff Rodriguez: Santos Gomez; Plaintiff Hansen: Kevin J. McInerney; Plaintiff Cubias: Allen Graves; Plaintiff Pinto: Roger R. Carter; Plaintiff D...
Judge: Judge Thomas Anderle |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.