Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Reichert, Stanford E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person (Limited) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | Hearing | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Biennial | |
July 27, 2021 | Hearing | Report to Court of Annual or Biennial Review Filed | |
February 26, 2021 | Hearing | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Annual Comment CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI BIENNIAL REVIEW DUE | |
July 17, 2020 | Hearing | Claim Fwd to Fin & Adm Off/Indigent Defense for Payment Comment CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $856.25 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT | |
July 02, 2020 | Hearing | Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Dept Comment CLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S35 FOR SIGNATURE. | |
July 01, 2020 | Hearing | Comment: Comment CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $856.25 RECEIVED FROM JAMES B. CHURCH FOR 10/30/17 TO 09/12/18. | |
June 30, 2020 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Comment HEARING RE: STATUS OF CONSERVATORSHIP STANFORD E. REICHERT,JUDGE CLERK: MARIA CARBAJAL COURT REPORTER TAMOI TOMLINSON;13864 COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO - APPEARANCES: PRESENT IN COURT IS TONGAN INTERPRETER, ELESI TUITUPOU, AVAILABLE TO PROVIDE ENGLISH/TONGAN INTERPRETATION FOR THE CONSERVATORS. - PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CONSERVATORS DID NOT APPEAR FOR TODAY'S HEARING. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
June 30, 2020 | Hearing | Miscellaneous Document Filed Comment CERTIFICATION OF UNAVAILABILITY INTERPRETER REQUEST FILED. | |
June 30, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment HEARING RE: STATUS OF CONSERVATORSHIP | |
June 24, 2020 | Hearing | Probate Notes - Hearing Date of Comment HRG OF 06/30/20 - PROBATE NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.