Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donna Jean Mclinn filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with J. Michael Welch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2010 |
CategoryConservatorship Of The Person |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION RE DISMISSAL FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON RFA RE REQUEST TO DISMISS CASE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL) Not Applicable |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF NO REPORT BY COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI BIENNIAL REVIEW DUE | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CI CASE FACESHEE T PLACED IN FILE - CONFIDENTIAL Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
REPORT TO COURT OF ANNUAL OR BIENNIAL REVIEW FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI BIENNIAL REVIEW DUE | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI BIENNIAL REVIEW DUE(FONTANA) | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPORT TO COURT OF ANNUAL OR BIENNIAL REVIEW FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF CI CASE FILE SCANNED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.