Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall Cardot Llp, against To Hoang, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Minute Order: Default Judgment Review (Debt Buyer) – Non-Appearance
Date: May 03, 2021Court Default Packet
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CAVALRY SPV I, LLC
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Plaintiffs Waiver of Security Interest on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CAVALRY SPV I, LLC
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: December 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CAVALRY SPV I, LLC and filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879-6118.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.