Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Merced Salgado, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Minute Order: Default Judgment Review (Debt Buyer) – Non-Appearance
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 25, 2021Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879-5324.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Court Default Packet
Date: February 08, 2021Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC and filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: October 09, 2020System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.