Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Asset Capital Recovery Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P, against Appellanes, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2016 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions517 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time517 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: June 10, 2019Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: August 15, 2017Complaint
Date: February 23, 2016Declaration
Date: July 24, 2017Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: December 05, 2019Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 21, 2018Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: October 12, 2017Judgment
Date: July 24, 2017Request For Dismissal
Date: July 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 6/10/2019Amount: $1,669.3 Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 6/10/2019 Amount: $1,669.35 |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 12/05/2019 Amount: $641.47 |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 388.50 Credit: 3770.67 Interest: 0.24 |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 10/12/17Amount: Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 10/12/17 Amount: $3,848.44 |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $323.50 Credit: $3,372.97 Interest: $1.45 |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 12/05/2019 Amount: $641.47 |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $191 Credit: $2216.53 Interest: $5.39 |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SAN MATEO Issued On: 6/10/2019 Amount: $1,669.35 |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $191.00 Credit: $738.12 Interest: $0.93 |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit INTEREST: 72.95, COSTS: 86.00. Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit INTEREST: 72.95, COSTS: 86.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.