Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macleod, James, against Grenier, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial596 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions596 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time595 days |
Judgment
Date: August 18, 2016Declaration
Date: March 20, 2015Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 18, 2016Court Trial
Date: August 18, 2016Conversion Action
Date: May 19, 2016Answer (Limited up to $10,000)
Date: May 11, 2015Order
Date: April 06, 2015Document
Date: March 23, 2015Motion
Date: February 24, 2015Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount: 7953.89 |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment COURT JUDGMENT Judgment COURT JUDGMENT |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 337.50 Memorandum of Costs |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV Minutes Order Court Trial 4 HOURS MEMORANDUN AT ISSUE Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of AFFIDAVIT OF JOSEPH GUENTHIER, ETC. Proof of Service by MAIL of AFFIDAVIT OF JOSEPH GUENTHIER, ETC. |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document AFFIDAVIT OF JOSPEH GUENTHER IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY AT TRIAL Document AFFIDAVIT OF JOSPEH GUENTHER IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY AT TRIAL |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Trial | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: MEMORANDUM TO SET TRIAL & FILE SENT TO MASTER CALENDAR. |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA. TIME ESTIMATE: 04 Conversion Action AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA. TIME ESTIMATE: 04:00 HOUR(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.