Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris, Stelios A, against Renazco, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions495 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time495 days |
This complaint is filed by Midland Funding LLC against Gloria Renazco and Does 1 through 10. Midland Funding LLC is seeking to recover $1,422.80, which is the amount due on a credit card account originally issued by Chase Bank USA, N.A. The account w...
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: May 22, 2017Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: May 04, 2016Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTOStatus: Wholly SatisfiedIssued on: 10/07/Amount: 958.8 Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTO Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 10/07/ Amount: 958.80 |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SACRAMENTO Issued On: 10/07/2016 Amount: 958.80 |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Declaration D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 05/09/16 AS FOLLOWS: Judgment by Court JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 05/09/16 AS FOLLOWS: |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COSTS: COSTS ARE $311.00. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $0.00. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AGAINST GLORIA RENAZCO |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Declaration DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.